US HB4235 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to award grants to certain entities for purposes of carrying out climate-resilient living shoreline projects that protect coastal communities, and for other purposes.
Title
Living Shorelines Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2021-06-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3764 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 511.
SB2633 (Related) 2021-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2633 (Related) 2021-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4235/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4235/BILLS-117hr4235ih.pdf |