US HB4181 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends federal arbitration law to exclude from the definition of "commerce" all contracts of employment. (Current law excludes only the employment contracts of seamen, railroad employees, and other classes of workers engaged in foreign or interstate commerce.) Declares that no predispute arbitration agreement shall be valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of an employment dispute. Defines "employment dispute" as a dispute between an employer and employee arising out of the employer-employee relationship. Exempts from this Act arbitration provisions in a contract between an employer and a labor organization. Denies to any such arbitration provision, however, the effect of waiving the right of an employee to seek judicial enforcement of a right arising under the U.S. Constitution, a state constitution, a federal or state statute, or related public policy.
Title
To amend title 9, United States Code, to exclude employment contracts and employment disputes from such title.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law. |
2012-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB987 (Related) 2011-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy.
HB1873 (Related) 2011-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
HB1873 (Related) 2011-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Contracts and agency
Labor-management relations
Law
Contracts and agency
Labor-management relations
Law
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4181/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4181/BILLS-112hr4181ih.pdf |