US HB4174 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foundations for Evidence-Based Policymaking Act of 2017 This bill requires departments and agencies identified in the Chief Financial Officers Act to submit annually to the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) and Congress a plan for identifying and addressing policy questions relevant to the programs, policies, and regulations of such departments and agencies.The plan must include: (1) a list of policy-relevant questions for developing evidence to support policymaking, and (2) a list of data for facilitating the use of evidence in policymaking. The OMB shall consolidate such plans into a unified evidence building plan. The bill establishes an Interagency Council on Evaluation Policy to assist the OMB in supporting government-wide evaluation activities and policies. The bill defines "evaluation" to mean an assessment using systematic data collection and analysis of one or more programs, policies, and organizations intended to assess their effectiveness and efficiency. Each department or agency shall designate a Chief Evaluation Officer to coordinate evidence-building activities and an official with statistical expertise to advise on statistical policy, techniques, and procedures. The OMB shall establish an Advisory Committee on Data for Evidence Building to advise on expanding access to and use of federal data for evidence building. Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act or the OPEN Government Data Act This bill requires open government data assets to be published as machine-readable data. Each agency shall: (1) develop and maintain a comprehensive data inventory for all data assets created by or collected by the agency, and (2) designate a Chief Data Officer who shall be responsible for lifecycle data management and other specified functions. The bill establishes in the OMB a Chief Data Officer Council for establishing government-wide best practices for the use, protection, dissemination, and generation of data and for promoting data sharing agreements among agencies. Confidential Information Protection and Statistical Efficiency Act of 2017 This bill codifies provisions relating to confidential information protection and statistical efficiency.
Title
Foundations for Evidence-Based Policymaking Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Ryan [R-WI] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment RC# 484 (Y: 356 N: 17 NV: 59 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 149, enrollment corrections on H.R. 4174 have been made. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 356 - 17 (Roll no. 484). |
2018-12-21 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 4174. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Mr. Walker moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10518-10526; text as House agree to Senate amendment: CR H10518-10525) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7871-7878) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.4171 Amendment SA 4171 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.4171 Amendment SA 4171 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S7870-7871; text: CR S7871-7878) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7870-7878) |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-11-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9281-9288) |
2017-11-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4174. |
2017-11-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9281-9291) |
2017-11-15 | House | Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303. |
2017-11-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-411. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2046 (Same As) 2017-10-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HCR149 (Related) 2018-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR149 (Related) 2018-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Business records
Census and government statistics
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Performance measurement
Policy sciences
Right of privacy
Technology assessment
Advisory bodies
Business records
Census and government statistics
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Performance measurement
Policy sciences
Right of privacy
Technology assessment