US HB4153 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) and the Department of Defense (DOD) to enter into arrangements for the sharing of medical facilities and services with urban Indian organizations. The VA and DOD shall reimburse an urban Indian organization where services are provided to beneficiaries eligible for services from either department.
Title
Health Care Access for Urban Native Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6127) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4153. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6126-6127) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Case moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-11-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492. |
2020-11-19 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-11-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-599, Part I. |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-08-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-08-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-08-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2365 (Same As) 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 388.
HB8200 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8200 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Health facilities and institutions
Indian social and development programs
Military medicine
Minority health
Native Americans
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' medical care
Health facilities and institutions
Indian social and development programs
Military medicine
Minority health
Native Americans
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' medical care