US HB4142 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safer Communities Act of 2017 This bill provides grants to expand mental health crisis assistance programs, support comprehensive school mental health programs, and enhance mental health and substance abuse needs of prisoners. The Department of Health and Human Services must expand research on violence associated with mental illness and substance abuse disorders. The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention must expand the National Violent Death Reporting System to all 50 states and research the causes, mechanisms, prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of injuries from gun violence. The bill states that no provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act prohibits physicians from asking patients about guns in their homes, speaking to a patient about gun safety, or reporting a patient's threat of violence. It amends the federal criminal code to specify that the term "committed to a mental institution" applies to involuntary inpatient or outpatient treatment. It amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to authorize state grants to remove firearms from individuals who pose a threat to themselves or others. The Department of Justice must promptly notify law enforcement agencies when a prohibited person attempts to purchase a firearm. The bill replaces statutory references to persons "adjudicated as a mental defective" with persons "adjudicated as ineligible due to disqualifying mental status." It amends the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to: establish procedures to restore firearm ownership rights after a mental health adjudication or commitment, require an annual report on record submissions due to domestic violence misdemeanor convictions, authorize state grants to improve the automation and transmittal of mental health and criminal history records, and require quarterly updates to federal agency record submissions. The bill reauthorizes the National Criminal History Records Improvement Program through FY2023.
Title
Safer Communities Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-10-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-10-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2913 (Related) 2017-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1370 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1370 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Firearms and explosives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Firearms and explosives
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Performance measurement
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4142/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4142/BILLS-115hr4142ih.pdf |