US HB4110 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the Rural Project Initiative under the transportation infrastructure finance and innovation (TIFIA) program. Specifically, the bill increases funding for the initiative from $2 million to $3 million; revises the duties of the National Surface Transportation and Innovative Finance Bureau to provide assistance and communicate best practices and financing and funding opportunities to entities under the program, including by conducting proactive outreach to communities located outside of metropolitan or micropolitan statistical area, and coordinating with other agencies that provide technical assistance for rural communities; and modifies reporting duties for the bureau.
Title
Helping Communities Invest in Infrastructure Act
Sponsors
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7095 (Related) 2020-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infrastructure development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infrastructure development
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4110/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4110/BILLS-116hr4110ih.pdf |