US HB4057 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-249.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-249.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to develop a comprehensive policy to improve outreach and transparency to veterans and members of the Armed Forces (members) through the provision of information on institutions of higher learning. Requires such information to: (1) include accreditation information and a description of available federal aid programs, and (2) be provided through hyperlinks on the VA website.Requires the Secretary, in developing the policy, to conduct a market survey to determine the availability of a commercially available off-the-shelf online tool that: (1) allows veterans to determine whether they are academically ready to engage in postsecondary education and training opportunities, and (2) provides a list of providers of such opportunities. Directs the Secretary to report to the congressional veterans and education committees on: (1) the policy developed, (2) a plan to implement the policy, and (3) survey results. Prohibits the Secretary from approving an educational institution that provides any commission, bonus, or other incentive payment based on success in securing enrollments. Directs the Secretary to ensure that the VA provides assistance to personnel of educational institutions who are charged with submitting reports or certifications to the VA. Prohibits the Secretary from paying more than $395 million in VA employee incentive awards or performance bonuses during FY2013.
Title
Improving Transparency of Education Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] |
Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 392 N: 3 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 392 N: 3 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 392 N: 3 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-249. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-12-30 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-30 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 3 (Roll no. 650). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7439-7440) |
2012-12-30 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7465-7466) |
2012-12-30 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Michaud objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-30 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 4057. |
2012-12-30 | Senate | Mr. Miller (FL) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7439-7442) |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | S.AMDT.3405 Amendment SA 3405 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | S.AMDT.3405 Amendment SA 3405 proposed by Senator Merkley for Senator Murray. (consideration: CR S8229)In the nature of a substitute. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8229) |
2012-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-09-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2012-09-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-09-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5817-5818) |
2012-09-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4057. |
2012-09-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5817-5821) |
2012-09-11 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-09-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 464. |
2012-09-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 112-646. |
2012-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2012-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-06-28 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2012-06-28 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-03-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Government information and archives
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation