US HB4042 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-25)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for funding from the Airport and Airway Trust Fund for all Federal Aviation Administration activities for a certain period in the event of a Government shutdown, and for other purposes.
Title
Aviation Funding Stability Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 484. |
2022-12-23 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2022-12-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-665, Part I. |
2021-10-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 58 - 5. |
2021-10-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-27 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |