US HB4031 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-294.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2026 the Great Lakes Restoration Initiative.
Title
GLRI Act of 2019 Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 36 (Y: 373 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-294. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7865) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 373 - 45 (Roll no. 36). (text: CR H799) |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H833-834) |
2020-02-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4031. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H799-805) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-11-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 231. |
2019-11-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-287. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2295 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Lakes and rivers
Marine pollution
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Lakes and rivers
Marine pollution
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection