US HB4031 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

GLRI Act of 2019 Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2019 This bill reauthorizes through FY2026 the Great Lakes Restoration Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GLRI Act of 2019 Great Lakes Restoration Initiative Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 36 (Y: 373 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2020-02-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 373 - 45 (Roll no. 36). (text: CR H799)
2020-02-05HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H833-834)
2020-02-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-02-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4031.
2020-02-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H799-805)
2020-02-05HouseMrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-11-13HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 231.
2019-11-13HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-287.
2019-09-19HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-09-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-19HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
2019-07-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-07-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-07-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2295 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback