US HB4000 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ozone National Ambient Air Quality Standard Deadline Harmonization Act of 2015 This bill delays the implementation of the Environmental Protection Agency's (EPA) 2015 national ambient air quality standards (NAAQS) for ozone issued under the Clean Air Act. Each state must designate all of its areas as attainment, nonattainment, or unclassifiable with respect to the 2015 ozone standards by October 26, 2024. The EPA must promulgate final designations for those areas by October 26, 2025. States must submit a state implementation plan for the 2015 ozone standards by October 26, 2026. The 2015 ozone standards do not apply to the review and disposition of an application for a preconstruction permit for the construction or modification of a major emitting facility or major stationary source if: (1) the application is completed before final designations under the Clean Air Act, or (2) the applicable permitting authority publishes a public notice of a preliminary determination or draft permit for the application before a certain date. The bill changes the interval by which the EPA must review its NAAQS for criteria pollutants from a 5-year review cycle to a 10-year review cycle. The EPA must not complete any review of ozone criteria or its ozone NAAQS before October 26, 2025, or propose any revisions to them.
Title
Ozone National Ambient Air Quality Standard Deadline Harmonization Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-11-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4775 (Related) 2016-06-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2882 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held.
SB2882 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/4000/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr4000/BILLS-114hr4000ih.pdf |