US SB2882 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-22 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-22 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ozone Standards Implementation Act of 2016
Title
Ozone Standards Implementation Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4000 (Related) 2015-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB4775 (Related) 2016-06-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4775 (Related) 2016-06-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Industrial facilities
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Environmental technology
Industrial facilities
Licensing and registrations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2882/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2882/BILLS-114s2882is.pdf |