US HB3937 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-234. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on October 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-234. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the building utilized as a United States courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Judge Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse". This bill designates the building utilized as a U.S. courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse" during the period in which the building is so utilized.
Title
To designate the building utilized as a United States courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Judge Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. George Holding [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-07 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-234. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-10-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (consideration: CR S6255) |
2016-09-20 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5702) |
2016-09-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3937. |
2016-09-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5702-5703) |
2016-09-20 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 100. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-464. |
2016-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2015-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-11-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1642 (Related) 2015-05-08 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
North Carolina
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
North Carolina