US HB1642 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the building utilized as a United States courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse". Designates the building utilized as a U.S. courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse" during the period in which the building is so utilized.
Title
To designate the building utilized as a United States courthouse located at 150 Reade Circle in Greenville, North Carolina, as the "Randy D. Doub United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] |
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 30. |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-106. |
2015-04-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-30 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3937 (Related) 2016-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-234. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
North Carolina
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
North Carolina