US HB391 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-6)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize a comprehensive, strategic approach for United States foreign assistance to developing countries to strengthen global health security, and for other purposes.
Title
Global Health Security Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 307 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2021-06-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 307 - 112 (Roll no. 188). (text: CR H3165-3169) |
2021-06-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3224-3225) |
2021-06-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-06-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 391. |
2021-06-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3165-3171) |
2021-06-28 | House | Mr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |