US HB3902 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Employer Retirement Savings Auto-Enrollment Credit Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a three-year $500 business-related tax credit for eligible small employers who include and maintain an automatic contribution arrangement in an employer-sponsored retirement plan. An "eligible employer" is an employer with no more than 100 employees who received at least $5,000 of compensation from the employer for the preceding year.
Title
Small Employer Retirement Savings Auto-Enrollment Credit Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1383 (Related) 2017-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3651-3652)
SB2526 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4523 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2526 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4523 (Related) 2017-12-01 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3902/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3902/BILLS-115hr3902ih.pdf |