US HB3882 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses pay equity for amateur athletes and other personnel. It permits a national governing body of an amateur sports organization eligible to be recognized, or to continue to be recognized, only if it provides equal investment, working conditions, and wages and other compensation to all amateur athletes, without discrimination based on sex. National governing bodies must report periodically to Congress regarding pay equity. Each report shall include (1) the median compensation for amateur athletes, coaches, trainers, managers, administrators, and officials, disaggregated by race, gender, and employment category; and (2) the minimum and maximum compensation paid to such personnel, disaggregated by race, gender, and employment category.
Title
Even Playing Field Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2253 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5064-5065)
HB3804 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3804 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Athletes
Congressional oversight
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Olympic games
Racial and ethnic relations
Sports and recreation
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
Women's rights
Congressional oversight
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Olympic games
Racial and ethnic relations
Sports and recreation
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
Women's rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3882/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3882/BILLS-116hr3882ih.pdf |