US HB3842 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-285.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-285.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Law Enforcement Training Centers Reform and Improvement Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to codify the establishment of the Federal Law Enforcement Training Center (FLETC) within the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). The FLETC must be headed by a director who reports to the DHS Secretary. The bill sets forth functions of the director, including to: establish and execute organizational plans and priorities; direct and manage training facilities, programs, and activities; develop training goals and curricula; disseminate homeland security information to law enforcement and security agencies and private sector stakeholders; conduct acquisition in compliance with federal law and regulations; coordinate and share digital resources with federal agencies; and collaborate to improve international instructional development, training, and technical assistance to foreign law enforcement. Additionally, the bill sets forth training responsibilities of the FLETC and partner organizations (i.e., federal agencies that participate in FLETC training programs under a formal memorandum of understanding). It authorizes the FLETC to: (1) train federal employees engaged in homeland security operations or law enforcement activities, and (2) execute strategic partnerships with state and local law enforcement agencies and coordinate with private sector stakeholders to provide training. The FLETC must consult with relevant law enforcement and security agencies to develop and deliver training programs. A partner organization must pay for and assign non-reimbursable detailed instructors to support training programs. The FLETC may conduct federal employee trainings at FLETC facilities, at off-site locations, or by distributed learning (e.g., online); detail its employees throughout DHS; charge fees for non-federal trainings; provide certain student support services; hire retired federal employees with training experience; and reimburse travel expenses of non-federal and intermittent federal employees. Individuals who attend FLETC training must reside in FLETC housing, to the extent practicable. Finally, the bill codifies existing authorities of the FLETC to spend funds to promote awareness of and support for law enforcement training, accept and use gifts for authorized purposes, accept reimbursement for the construction or renovation of training facilities, obligate funds in anticipation of reimbursements, purchase uniforms and passenger vehicles, and provide room and board for student interns. It also authorizes the FLETC to spend funds to honor and memorialize FLETC graduates who have died in the line of duty.
Title
Federal Law Enforcement Training Centers Reform and Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-08 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 420 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-285. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-13 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H7586; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7586) |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Mr. Smith (NJ) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendments. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5171 Amendment SA 5171 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7104-7105) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.5171 Amendment SA 5171 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Perdue. (consideration: CR S7104-7105; text: CR S7105) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7104-7106) |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 2 (Roll no. 680). (text: CR H9037-9038) |
2015-12-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9062) |
2015-12-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on the motion to suspend the rules and pass H.R. 3842. |
2015-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3842. |
2015-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9037-9040, H9041) |
2015-12-08 | House | Mr. Carter (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-11-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 262. |
2015-11-19 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2015-11-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-343, Part I. |
2015-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2781 (Related) 2016-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Terrorism
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Terrorism