US HB3796 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 81.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 81.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the extension of taxes funding the Airport and Airway Trust Fund and to require the designation of certain airports as ports of entry.
Title
To provide for the extension of taxes funding the Airport and Airway Trust Fund and to require the designation of certain airports as ports of entry.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 81. |
2023-06-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-105. |
2023-06-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 18. |
2023-06-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-06-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1804 (Related) 2023-03-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB222 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3935 (Related) 2024-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 118-63.
SB222 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3935 (Related) 2024-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 118-63.