US HB3714 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-166.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Became Public Law No: 111-166.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Daniel Pearl Freedom of the Press Act of 2009 - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to expand the annual Country Reports on Human Rights Practices to include: (1) a description of the status of freedom of the press in each country reviewed in the report; (2) identification of countries in which there were violations of freedom of the press; and (3) in countries where there are particularly severe violations of freedom of the press, whether such governments participate in or condone such violations and the actions such governments have taken to preserve the safety and independence of the media and ensure the prosecution of individuals who attack or murder journalists.
Title
Daniel Pearl Freedom of the Press Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Became Public Law No: 111-166. | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by President. | |
2010-05-06 | Presented to President. | |
2010-04-30 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-04-29 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2981) | |
2009-12-17 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. | |
2009-12-16 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-12-16 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-12-16 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 403 - 12 (Roll no. 989). (text: CR 12/15/2009 H14916-14917) | |
2009-12-16 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H15431) | |
2009-12-15 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Berman objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-12-15 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3714. | |
2009-12-15 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H14916-14921) | |
2009-12-15 | Mr. Berman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-10-01 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2410 (Related) 2009-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1739 (Related) 2009-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
SB1739 (Related) 2009-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 246.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting