US HB3693 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cents and Sensibility Act - Revises the discretionary authority of the Secretary of the Treasury to prescribe the weight and the composition of the alloy of the one-cent coin. Requires that the one-cent coin be: (1) produced primarily of steel, and (2) treated to impart a copper color to its appearance so that the appearance is similar to one-cent coins produced of a copper-zinc alloy. Instructs the Secretary, in minting 1-cent coins, to use only steel produced in the United States unless: (1) the Secretary determines doing so would be inconsistent with the public interest, or (2) steel is not produced in the United States in sufficient and reasonably available quantities. Directs the Secretary to submit to certain congressional committees the initial report concerning production costs and technologies required by the Coin Modernization, Oversight, and Continuity Act of 2010.
Title
Cents and Sensibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology. |
2011-12-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3694 (Related) 2012-11-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Buy American requirements
Congressional oversight
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Metals
Public contracts and procurement
Congressional oversight
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Metals
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3693/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3693/BILLS-112hr3693ih.pdf |