US HB3675 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Water Infrastructure Improvements for the Nation Act to extend certain contract prepayment authority.
Title
Western Water Accelerated Revenue Repayment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2023-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-26 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. |
2023-06-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3675/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3675/BILLS-118hr3675ih.pdf |