US HB3650 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State National Forest Management Act of 2015 This bill directs the Department of Agriculture, through the Forest Service, to convey to a state up to 2 million acres of eligible portions of the National Forest System (NFS) in it that it elects to acquire through enactment by the state legislature of a bill meeting certain criteria. Portions of the NFS conveyed to a state shall be administered and managed primarily for timber production.
Title
State National Forest Management Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15. |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-14 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2016-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2015-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3650/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3650/BILLS-114hr3650ih.pdf |