US HB3557 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To streamline Federal, State, and local permitting and regulatory reviews to expedite the deployment of communications facilities, and for other purposes.
Title
American Broadband Deployment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 192. |
2023-10-02 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2023-10-02 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2023-10-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-240, Part I. |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 23. |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |