US HB3482 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the National Center for the Advancement of Aviation.
Title
National Center for the Advancement of Aviation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 369 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 369 - 56 (Roll no. 457). (text: CR H8164-8166) |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8179) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3482. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8164-8167) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Carson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 380. |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-505. |
2022-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-05-25 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E573-574) |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1752 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.