US HB3463 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize the use of the Strategic National Stockpile to enhance medical supply chain elasticity and establish and maintain domestic reserves of critical medical supplies, and for other purposes.
Title
Medical Supplies for Pandemics Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1693 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1974 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1974 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3463/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3463/BILLS-117hr3463ih.pdf |