US HB3442 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to encourage and expand the use of prescribed fire on land managed by the Department of the Interior or the Forest Service, with an emphasis on units of the National Forest System in the western United States, and for other purposes.
Title
National Prescribed Fire Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1734 (Related) 2021-10-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3442/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3442/BILLS-117hr3442ih.pdf |