US HB3325 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ACE Kids Act Advancing Care for Exceptional Kids Act This bill amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to establish a state Medicaid option to provide for medical assistance with respect to coordinated care provided through a health home (i.e., a designated provider or team of health-care professionals) for children with medically complex conditions. A state shall make payments for such health-home services regardless of whether they are provided through a fee-for-service or managed-care system. For an initial period of eight fiscal-year quarters, the federal matching rate applicable to such payments shall be increased by 20 percentage points, not to exceed 90%. A state that exercises this option shall specify its methodology for determining payment and evaluating quality of care, in accordance with requirements established by the bill. In addition, the state must meet specified requirements regarding hospital referrals, out-of-state providers, education and outreach, data collection, and reporting. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must issue guidance on best practices for using out-of-state providers to provide care to children with medically complex conditions. The Medicaid and Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) Payment and Access Commission must report to Congress and to the Department of Health and Human Services on specified matters related to children with medically complex conditions.
Title
ACE Kids Act Advancing Care for Exceptional Kids Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-07 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-09-07 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Cancer
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medicaid
Medical research
Mental health
State and local government operations
Child health
Congressional oversight
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medicaid
Medical research
Mental health
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3325/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3325/BILLS-115hr3325ih.pdf |