US HB3237 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-31.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-31.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2021, and for other purposes.
Title
Emergency Security Supplemental to Respond to January 6th Appropriations Act, 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-29 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment (Y: 416 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-29 - Senate - Passed Senate, under the order of 7/29/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment RC# 287 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-29 - Senate - Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to amendment SA 2123 S.Amdt.2123 RC# 286 (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - On passage (Y: 213 N: 212 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 209 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-07-29 - Senate - Passed Senate, under the order of 7/29/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment RC# 287 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-29 - Senate - Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to amendment SA 2123 S.Amdt.2123 RC# 286 (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - On passage (Y: 213 N: 212 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 209 N: 218 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-31. |
2021-07-30 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-07-30 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-07-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-07-29 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 11 (Roll no. 250). (text: CR H4265-4267) |
2021-07-29 | House | The House proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 3237. |
2021-07-29 | House | Ms. DeLauro moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H4265-4270) |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2123 Amendment SA 2123 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2124 Amendment SA 2124 proposed by Senator Shelby for Senator Cotton to Amendment SA 2123. (consideration: CR S5155; text: CR S5155) To require a report to Congress on the health of the Afghan special immigrant visa program. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2123 Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to amendment SA 2123 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 286. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2124 Amendment SA 2124 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2123 Motion to waive all applicable budgetary discipline with respect to amendment SA 2123 made in Senate. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2123 Point of order that the amendment violates section 302(c) of the CBA raised in Senate with respect to amendment SA 2123. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.2123 Amendment SA 2123 proposed by Senator Leahy. (consideration: CR S5155-5156; text: CR S5182-5185) In the nature of a substitute. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 11 (Roll no. 250). (text: CR H4265-4267) |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, under the order of 7/29/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 287. |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5154-5156) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 63. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2021-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-20 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 213 - 212, 3 Present (Roll no. 156). (text: CR H2617-2621) |
2021-05-20 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 209 - 218 (Roll no. 155). |
2021-05-20 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2021-05-20 | House | Mr. Gonzales, Tony moved to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. (text: CR H2630-2631) |
2021-05-20 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2021-05-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3237. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3233 and H.R. 3237. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3233 and H.R. 3237 under a closed rule. The resolution provides that the previous question shall be ordered on both bills without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 409. (consideration: CR H2617-2632) |
2021-05-19 | House | Rule H. Res. 409 passed House. |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 409 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3233 and H.R. 3237. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3233 and H.R. 3237 under a closed rule. The resolution provides that the previous question shall be ordered on both bills without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB284 (Related) 2021-01-12 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HR409 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3385 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB4498 (Related) 2021-07-16 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2032 (Related) 2021-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2083 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2311 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 99.
HR409 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3385 (Related) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB4498 (Related) 2021-07-16 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2032 (Related) 2021-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2083 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2311 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 99.