US HB3385 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-29)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of State and the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to postpone the medical exam requirement for qualifying citizens or nationals of Afghanistan seeking entry into the United States as special immigrants. Specifically, this bill applies to an existing program that provides special immigrant status to an individual (or the spouse or child of such an individual) who (1) faithfully performed sensitive and trusted duties for the U.S. government or the International Security Assistance Force in Afghanistan on or after October 7, 2001, and (2) has experienced or is experiencing an ongoing serious threat due to the performance of those duties. Under this bill, the State Department and DHS may jointly issue a blanket waiver of any requirement for such individuals to undergo a medical exam before admission into the United States. DHS shall ensure, to the greatest extent practicable, that individuals admitted under such a waiver undergo medical exams no later than 30 days after admission into the United States. Such an individual shall be admitted as a conditional permanent resident. DHS shall remove the conditions once the individual receives and passes a medical examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOPE for Afghan SIVs Act of 2021 Honoring Our Promises through Expedition for Afghan SIVs Act of 2021 Honoring Our Promises through Expedition for Afghan SIVs Act of 2021

Sponsors

Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]
Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL]
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA]
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2021-07-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-06-29HousePursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 504, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1500, as amended; H.R. 2471, as amended; H.R. 3261; H.R. 3283, as amended; and H.R. 3385, as amended; and the following resolutions were agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 186; and H. Res. 402, as amended. (consideration: CR H3258-3262; text: CR H3260-3261)
2021-06-29HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 504, proceedings on H.R. 3385 are considered vacated.
2021-06-28HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-06-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3385.
2021-06-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3220-3222; text: CR H3220)
2021-06-28HouseMs. Dean moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-05-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-05-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR504 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2032 (Related) 2021-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2083 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3237 (Related) 2021-07-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-31. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback