US HB3179 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transparency and Accountability for Business Standards Act This bill requires a federal banking agency to publish for notice and comment: (1) the agency's rationale for, and cost-benefit analysis regarding, the adoption of any prudential regulation that is substantively more stringent than a corresponding international prudential standard; and (2) a proposal for, or the agency's rationale for not proposing, the repeal or amendment of any prudential regulation that is effectively superseded by the implementation of an international prudential standard. A federal banking agency must issue a report regarding any such final rule issued before the bill's enactment and on or after January 1, 2007.
Title
Transparency and Accountability for Business Standards Act
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 473. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-620. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 26. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Credit and credit markets
Economic performance and conditions
Finance and financial sector
International organizations and cooperation
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Credit and credit markets
Economic performance and conditions
Finance and financial sector
International organizations and cooperation