US HB3099 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish in the Department of State the position of Special Envoy for the Abraham Accords, and for other purposes.
Title
Special Envoy for the Abraham Accords Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 251 (Y: 413 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2023-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 13 (Roll no. 251). (text: 6/12/2023 CR H2800-2801) |
2023-06-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2834-2835) |
2023-06-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3099. |
2023-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2800-2803) |
2023-06-12 | House | Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-05-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-05-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1268 (Related) 2023-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.