US HB3065 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the transportation of the remains of members of the Armed Forces who die outside of the United States. It requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to provide, in the case of such a member whose remains are returned through the mortuary facility at Dover Air Force Base, Delaware, transportation of such remains to the applicable escorted remains destination. (Under current law, this service is limited to the remains of those who die in a combat theater of operations.) The bill also requires DOD to extend travel privileges to family members of those personnel whose remains are returned in this manner.
Title
Fallen Heroes Family Travel Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-06-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2494 (Same As) 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2494 (Same As) 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Delaware
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation costs
Cemeteries and funerals
Delaware
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3065/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3065/BILLS-116hr3065ih.pdf |