US SB2494 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the transportation of the remains of members of the Armed Forces who die outside of the United States. It requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to provide, in the case of such a member whose remains are returned through the mortuary facility at Dover Air Force Base, Delaware, transportation of such remains to the applicable escorted remains destination. (Under current law, this service is limited to the remains of those who die in a combat theater of operations.) The bill also requires DOD to extend travel privileges to family members of those personnel whose remains are returned in this manner.
Title
Fallen Heroes Family Travel Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB3065 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB3065 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Delaware
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Delaware
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2494/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2494/BILLS-116s2494is.pdf |