US HB3058 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gateway Arch National Park Designation Act This bill designates the Jefferson National Expansion Memorial in Missouri as the "Gateway Arch National Park."
Title
Gateway Arch National Park Designation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 399. |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-534. |
2018-01-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1438 (Same As) 2018-02-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-128. (TXT | PDF)