US HB3018 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gun Violence Prevention and Safe Communities Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the excise tax on the sale of firearms by manufacturers, producers, or importers, to: (1) increase the rate of such tax to 20% on pistols, revolvers, and other firearms and on any lower frame or receiver for a firearm; and (2) impose a 50% tax on shells and cartridges. Exempts any department, agency, or instrumentality of the United States from such tax. Allocates revenues from the increased excise tax under this Act for law enforcement and public safety grant programs, including programs for research on gun violence and its prevention. Increases the occupational tax on importers, manufacturers, and dealers in firearms and the transfer tax on firearms. Modifies the definition of "firearm" for excise tax purposes to include a semiautomatic pistol chambered for cartridges and configured with receivers commonly associated with rifles and capable of accepting detachable magazines.
Title
Gun Violence Prevention and Safe Communities Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2013-09-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2013-08-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-08-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Crime prevention
Criminal justice information and records
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Firearms and explosives
Inflation and prices
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Manufacturing
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Violent crime
Criminal justice information and records
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Firearms and explosives
Inflation and prices
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Manufacturing
Research administration and funding
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3018/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3018/BILLS-113hr3018ih.pdf |