US HB3015 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 10, United States Code, to enhance the prevention of sexual assault and related offenses in the Armed Forces, to enhance protections of victims of such offenses, to improve the investigation and prosecution of such offenses, and for other purposes.
Title
Combating Military Sexual Assault Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1495 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Defense
Domestic violence and child abuse
Due process and equal protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Research administration and funding
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Defense
Domestic violence and child abuse
Due process and equal protection
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Judicial procedure and administration
Lawyers and legal services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Research administration and funding
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3015/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3015/BILLS-116hr3015ih.pdf |