US HB298 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 112-107.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 112-107.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 500 East Whitestone Boulevard in Cedar Park, Texas, as the "Army Specialist Matthew Troy Morris Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 500 East Whitestone Boulevard in Cedar Park, Texas, as the "Army Specialist Matthew Troy Morris Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Francisco Canseco [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-14 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 391 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-107. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-04-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2885) |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-11-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2011-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 838). (text: CR H7412) |
2011-11-14 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7418-7419) |
2011-11-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 298. |
2011-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7412-7413) |
2011-11-14 | House | Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-11-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-11-03 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Discharged. |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy . |
2011-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Texas
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Texas