US HB2938 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-52. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-52. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the treatment of certain veterans' benefits in bankruptcy. Specifically, the bill excludes from a debtor's current monthly income certain benefits, including disability benefits, paid by the Department of Veterans Affairs or the Department of Defense.
Title
HAVEN Act Honoring American Veterans in Extreme Need Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-52. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-08-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-08-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5321) |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7215-7216) |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2938. |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7215-7216) |
2019-07-23 | House | Mr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 129. |
2019-07-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-169. |
2019-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4124) |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB679 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Disability assistance
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Disability assistance
Finance and financial sector
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation