US HB2928 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Became Public Law No: 114-170. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Became Public Law No: 114-170. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 201 B Street in Perryville, Arkansas, as the "Harold George Bennett Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 201 B Street in Perryville, Arkansas, as the "Harold George Bennett Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 201 B Street in Perryville, Arkansas, as the "Harold George Bennett Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-170. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3378) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-04-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1778) |
2016-04-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2928. |
2016-04-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1778-1779) |
2016-04-18 | House | Mr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-10-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arkansas
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service