US HB2909 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Firefighters and Promoting Innovation Act This bill directs the President to establish an interagency working group to study the use of unmanned aircraft systems for wildland firefighting. The working group shall: develop standards and best practices for the use of unmanned aircraft systems for wildland firefighting to assist in fire suppression, to provide real-time updates for firefighters, and to reduce the risk of firefighter fatalities due to wildland firefighting and related aircraft accidents; identify opportunities to use existing federal unmanned aircraft systems to lower the costs of the use of unmanned aircraft systems for wildland firefighting; with respect to the use of unmanned aircraft systems for wildland firefighting, assess opportunities to improve interagency coordination, the efficacy of current technology, and the potential efficacy of emerging technology; assess the implications for the Fourth Amendment of any standards, best practices, or recommendations under this Act with respect to the use of unmanned aircraft systems; and report to Congress and to the National Wildfire Coordinating Group on the results of its work.
Title
Protecting Firefighters and Promoting Innovation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Technology assessment
Transportation and public works
Worker safety and health
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government studies and investigations
Technology assessment
Transportation and public works
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2909/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2909/BILLS-114hr2909ih.pdf |