US HB2871 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of certain Bureau of Reclamation facilities and federal land, excluding facilities and land in California, to convey water to recharge certain aquifers.
Title
Aquifer Recharge Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1570 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 276.
Subjects
Hydrology and hydrography
Land use and conservation
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Land use and conservation
Public contracts and procurement
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Watersheds
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2871/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2871/BILLS-116hr2871ih.pdf |