US HB2833 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a program to improve community connectivity by identifying and removing or mitigating infrastructural barriers that create obstacles to mobility or economic development or expose the community to pollution and other health and safety risks, and for other purposes.
Title
Reconnecting Communities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1202 (Same As) 2021-12-15 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
HB2589 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2859 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB2589 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2859 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2833/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2833/BILLS-117hr2833ih.pdf |