US HB2796 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for 4,000 additional special immigrant visas to qualified nationals of Afghanistan who were employed by or on behalf of the United States since October 7, 2001. The visa allotment, in addition to any unused allocations of such special immigrant visas from FY2015 through FY2017, shall be available beginning FY2019, and unused visas shall carry over to subsequent fiscal years until exhausted. The Department of State Inspector General shall report to Congress on obstacles to protecting Afghan and Iraqi allies through special immigrant visa programs and recommendations for improving future programs.
Title
Afghan Allies Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E614) |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1474 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Afghanistan
Asia
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Visas and passports
Worker safety and health
Asia
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Visas and passports
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2796/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2796/BILLS-116hr2796ih.pdf |