US HB2788 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to eliminate the cap on full-time employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs who provide equal employment opportunity counseling.
Title
VA Equal Employment Opportunity Counselor Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 403, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 144, as amended; H.R. 204, as amended; H.R. 210, as amended; H.R. 240; H.R. 707, as amended; H.R. 711, as amended; H.R. 1157, as amended; H.R. 1447, as amended; H.R. 1510, as amended; H.R. 1711, as amended; H.R. 2027; H.R. 2167, as amended; H.R. 2441; H.R. 2494; H.R. 2533; H.R. 2655, as amended; H.R. 2695, H.R. 2704; H.R. 2788; H.R. 2878, as amended; and H.R. 3008. (consideration: CR H2482-2520; text: CR H2517-2518) |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 403, proceedings on H.R. 2788 are considered vacated. |
2021-05-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2788. |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2362-2363; text: CR H2362) |
2021-05-17 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 20. |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 117-35. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.