US HB2787 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vet HP Act Veterans-Specific Education for Tomorrow's Health Professionals Act This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a three-year pilot program at a minimum of five VA medical centers to provide undergraduate students a clinical observation experience. The VA shall ensure that such program: increases the awareness, knowledge, and empathy of future medical professionals toward the medical conditions common to veterans; increases the diversity of the recruitment pool of future VA physicians; provides a diverse clinical observation experience commensurate with the standard expectations for medical school applications; and expands clinical observation opportunities for all students by encouraging students of all backgrounds to consider a career in medicine. The VA shall select undergraduate students who are U.S. citizens enrolled in an accredited science or medical program of study to participate in the program, with priority to students who resided in a health professional shortage area and who are the first in their immediate family to attend an undergraduate institution.
Title
Vet HP Act Veterans-Specific Education for Tomorrow's Health Professionals Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7132) |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2787. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7132-7133) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 670. |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-867. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Higher education
Medical education
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Higher education
Medical education
Veterans' medical care