US HB2786 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide tax rate parity among all tobacco products, and for other purposes.
Title
Tobacco Tax Equity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB411 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S859-863)
SB1314 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S2170-2171)
HB3407 (Related) 2021-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1314 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S2170-2171)
HB3407 (Related) 2021-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB8862 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2786/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2786/BILLS-117hr2786ih.pdf |