US HB273 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the President, the Vice President, and certain candidates for President and Vice President to disclose federal income tax returns for the ten most recent taxable years. The returns must be disclosed to the Federal Election Commission (FEC), which must make the returns publicly available after redacting information that is necessary for protecting against identity theft, such as Social Security numbers. If the tax returns are not disclosed to the FEC as required by this bill, the Internal Revenue Service must provide the returns to the FEC upon receiving a written request from the FEC.
Title
Presidential Tax Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB706 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB706 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/273/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr273/BILLS-116hr273ih.pdf |