US HB2658 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Venezuela Humanitarian Assistance and Defense of Democratic Governance Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of State to work through nongovernmental organizations to provide public health commodities, basic food commodities, and related technical assistance to Venezuela. The State Department shall submit a multi-year strategy to Congress that: (1) describes how the United States will secure international support for the provision of humanitarian assistance to Venezuela, and (2) identifies governments that will provide financial and technical assistance. The President shall use U.S. influence to place the humanitarian and political crisis in Venezuela on the United Nations Security Council agenda and to secure a statement urging the Venezuelan government to allow the delivery of humanitarian relief. If the government of Venezuela refuses to allow such delivery, the President shall use U.S. influence to secure a U.N. Security Council resolution: (1) directing the government of Venezuela to allow access for humanitarian agencies; and (2) calling on such government to allow the delivery of food and medicine, end human rights violations, agree to free elections, cease violence, and release all political prisoners. The State Department shall work: (1) with the Organization of American States to ensure international observation that contributes to free and transparent electoral processes in Venezuela, and (2) to defend internationally recognized human rights for the people of Venezuela, support the efforts of independent media outlets to share information beyond the limited channels made available by the Venezuelan government, facilitate open access to the Internet, and combat government corruption. The State Department shall report to Congress regarding: (1) the involvement in corruption of senior Venezuelan officials, including members of the National Electoral Council, the judicial system, and government security forces; and (2) Russian cooperation with the government and armed forces of Venezuela. The bill amends the Venezuela Defense of Human Rights and Civil Society Act of 2014 to: (1) direct the President to impose sanctions on any current or former official of the Venezuela government who is determined to have perpetrated significant acts of public corruption or actions or policies that undermine democratic processes or institutions, and (2) extend the requirement to impose sanctions under such Act until December 31, 2022.
Title
Venezuela Humanitarian Assistance and Defense of Democratic Governance Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 671 (Y: 388 N: 29 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 29 (Roll no. 671). (text: CR 12/5/2017 H9653-9656) |
2017-12-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (CR H9745-9746) |
2017-12-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2658. |
2017-12-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9653-9659) |
2017-12-05 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Judicial procedure and administration
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Nutrition and diet
Oil and gas
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Venezuela
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Judicial procedure and administration
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
Nutrition and diet
Oil and gas
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Venezuela