US HB2642 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates (1) certain federal land in the Olympic National Forest in the state of Washington as wilderness and as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System; and (2) certain other land, identified on the same map as such proposed areas, as potential wilderness. The bill designates as wild, scenic, or recreational rivers specified segments of the following rivers in the state of Washington Elwha River, Dungeness River, Big Quilcene River, Dosewallips River, Duckabush River, Hamma Hamma River, South Fork Skokomish River, Middle Fork Satsop River, West Fork Satsop River, Wynoochee River, East Fork Humptulips River, West Fork Humptulips River, Quinault River, Queets River, Hoh River, Bogachiel River, South Fork Calawah River, Sol Duc River, and Lyre River. The Department of Agriculture may take necessary measures to control fire, insects, and diseases in the wilderness areas designated by this bill.
Title
Wild Olympics Wilderness and Wild and Scenic Rivers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 311. |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-388. |
2019-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 11. |
2019-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1382 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats